Salisbury v. Catholic Care Campus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kamika Salisbury
Defendant: Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas d/b/a Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas d/b/a Santa Marta, Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas and Catholic Care Campus, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02475
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Party. Defendant Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas d/b/a Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas d/b/a Santa Marta is dismissed with prejudice, and Catholic Care Campus, Inc. d/b/a Santa Marta is added as the sole party defendant in its place. The court further orders that defendant Catholic Care Campus, Inc. d/b/a Santa Marta shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or by October 25, 2019. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/2/2019. (heo)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(as)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant and to Set Defendant's Answer Deadline by Defendant Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Cross, William). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 9/27/2019 (sz).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all further pretrial proceedings. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/26/2019 for Defendant Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/12/2019. (gw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Kamika Salisbury upon Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (Allen, Lauren)
August 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (heo)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892291.), filed by Kamika Salisbury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Allen, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salisbury v. Catholic Care Campus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas d/b/a Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas d/b/a Santa Marta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Charities of Northeast Kansas
Represented By: William D. Cross, Jr.
Represented By: Bridget B. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Care Campus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamika Salisbury
Represented By: Lauren Perkins Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?