Gardner v. Coleman American Moving Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron Gardner
Defendant: Coleman American Moving Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02478
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Coleman American Moving Services, Inc. is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including 10/21/2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Coleman American Moving Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Russell, Kyle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of Coleman American Moving Services, Inc.. (Russell, Kyle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Aaron Gardner upon Coleman American Moving Services, Inc. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019 (Brown, Charles)
August 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Coleman American Moving Services, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (hw)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jayson A. Watkins on behalf of Aaron Gardner. (Watkins, Jayson)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Aaron Gardner. (Brown, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892758.), filed by Aaron Gardner.(Brown, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Coleman American Moving Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Gardner
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman American Moving Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?