Goodfriend v. MS Electronics LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Goodfriend
Defendant: MS Electronics LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02479
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 third unopposed motion for extension of time. For good cause shown, defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by November 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/11/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant MS Electronics LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wright, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 unopposed motion for extension of time until October 11, 2019, for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant MS Electronics LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wood, Mitchell)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Ann Wright on behalf of MS Electronics LLC. (Wright, Kathryn)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by September 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 09/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MS Electronics LLC identifying None. as corporate parent . (Wood, Mitchell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant MS Electronics LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wood, Mitchell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of MS Electronics LLC. (Wood, Mitchell)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Richard Goodfriend upon MS Electronics LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (Brown, Charles)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jayson A. Watkins on behalf of Richard Goodfriend. (Watkins, Jayson)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Richard Goodfriend. (Brown, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892893.), filed by Richard Goodfriend.(Brown, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodfriend v. MS Electronics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Goodfriend
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Electronics LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Wright
Represented By: Mitchell E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?