Stanford v. Exide Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Stanford
Defendant: Exide Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02487
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 11/15/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/15/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/18/19. (aw)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cary Ichter for Exide Technologies, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Oladimeji Ogunsola for Exide Technologies, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/11/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Oladimeji Ogunsola to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4946815.) by Defendant Exide Technologies, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Oladimeji Ogunsola, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form for Oladimeji Ogunsola)(Prell, Benjamin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Cary Ichter to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-4946783.) by Defendant Exide Technologies, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Cary Ichter, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form for Cary Ichter)(Prell, Benjamin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exide Technologies, Inc. (Prell, Benjamin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Exide Technologies, Inc..(Prell, Benjamin)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Deadline for Exide Technologies, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 10/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/23/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Exide Technologies, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Prell, Benjamin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin R. Prell on behalf of Exide Technologies, Inc. (Prell, Benjamin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Anthony Stanford upon Exide Technologies, Inc. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019 (Suhr, Jeremy)
August 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Exide Technologies, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number K4631057963. (ca)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Anthony Stanford. (ca)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Anthony Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B. Right to Sue)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford v. Exide Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exide Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Oladimeji Ogunsola
Represented By: Benjamin R. Prell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Stanford
Represented By: Erin D. Lawrence
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?