Dove v. Preferred Care Partners Management Group LP et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Dove
Defendant: Preferred Care Partners Management Group LP and Arjun Purvis
Case Number: 2:2019cv02492
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Preferred Care Partners Management Group. (Holland, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint (attorney), by Plaintiff Marilyn Dove . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit A)(Daniels, James)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Exhibit A of the Complaint is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Marilyn Dove. (Daniels, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4896987.), filed by Marilyn Dove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Human Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue)(Daniels, James) Modified on 8/21/2019 (ca). Exhibit A blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dove v. Preferred Care Partners Management Group LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Dove
Represented By: James Lee Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Care Partners Management Group LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arjun Purvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?