Thompson v. Ally Financial, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William C. Thompson
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Ally Financial, Inc., Experian Information Solutions Inc., Transunion LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02503
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. by William C. Thompson. (Stecklein, Alan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Trans Union LLC by William C. Thompson. (Stecklein, Alan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by William C. Thompson. (Stecklein, Alan)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew M. Hilderbrand for Experian Information Solutions Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/20/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Matthew Hilderbrand re: motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #17 by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.(gw)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Matthew Hilderbrand to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4926177.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Webb, Danne)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/28/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/28/2019. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/17/19. (ss)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ethan G. Ostroff for Ally Financial, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Ethan G. Ostroff to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4909358.) by Defendant Ally Financial, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of movant Ethan G. Ostroff, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mitten, Nelson)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ally Financial, Inc. (Mitten, Nelson)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Ally Financial, Inc..(Mitten, Nelson)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Mouber, Bryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Webb, Danne)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc. identifying Experian plc as corporate parent (Webb, Danne) (Modified on 8/29/2019 to delete duplicate text. (heo))
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTION, INC.S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS PETITION by Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Webb, Danne)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nelson L. Mitten on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (Mitten, Nelson)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by William C. Thompson. (Stecklein, Alan)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Transunion LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mouber, Bryan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Transunion LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, KS, case number 2019-LM-003608 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4901765.), filed by Transunion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Mouber, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Ally Financial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Guillermo Gabriel Zorogastua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Represented By: Nelson L. Mitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Andrea S. McMurtry
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Represented By: Matthew M. Hilderbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Represented By: James Scott Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Represented By: James Scott Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Thompson
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Represented By: Michael H. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?