Williamson v. UPS et al
Plaintiff: Andy T. Williamson
Defendant: UPS, Chris Gay and Chris Verbeck
Case Number: 2:2019cv02506
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UPS identifying None as corporate parent . (Krstulic, Carol)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by UPS, Chris Verbeck.(Krstulic, Carol)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants UPS, Chris Verbeck (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Right to Sue)(Krstulic, Carol)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 11/14/2019) by Defendants UPS, Chris Verbeck (Krstulic, Carol)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/24/2019 for Defendants UPS, Chris Verbeck, Chris Gay to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/10/2019. (gw) Modified on 10/11/2019 to add defendant UPS (gw).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Modify Civil Cover Sheet filed by Plaintiff. The #2 Civil Cover Sheet is hereby amended to add the statutory citations Plaintiff lists in his motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/30/2019. Mailed to pro se party Andy T. Williamson by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail USM 285 by Andy T. Williamson upon Chris Verbeck served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (ca)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail USM 285 by Andy T. Williamson upon Chris Gay served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (ca)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail USM 285 by Andy T. Williamson upon UPS served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (ca)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Modify Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Andy T. Williamson (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (heo)
August 28, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document Summons Issued mailed to Andy T. Williamson on 8/28/2019 by regular mail. (ca)
August 28, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chris Gay, UPS, Chris Verbeck. (issued to US Marshal USM 285 for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (in forma pauperis). The Clerk shall issue Summons for Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint shall be made by a United States Marshal or Deputy Marshal or by a person specially appointed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2019. Mailed to pro se party Andy T. Williamson by regular mail. (ts)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Andy T. Williamson (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Andy T. Williamson. (ca)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Andy T. Williamson.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. UPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Verbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy T. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?