McKinzy v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael E. McKinzy, Sr.
Defendant: Susan Fox, Kevin Richardson, Susan Quinn, Chris Ashland, Michael Fields, David Ellis and Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02528
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $400, receipt number T4631013268 (kkw)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING IN FULL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #4 Report and Recommendations. MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 3) is denied; Motion terminated. Plaintiff is ordered to prepay the full filing fee of $400 within 30 days of this order, in order for this action to proceed. Failure to pay the filing fee by that time will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/30/2019.Mailed to pro se party Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. by regular mail (ydm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr.(hw)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (in forma pauperis) filed by Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. The Magistrate Judge recommends that Plaintiff's motion be denied, that Plaintiff should be ordered to prepay the full filing fee of $400 within 30 days in order for this action to proceed, and cautioned that failure to pay the filing fee by that time will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the court's privacy policy. Objections to R&R due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/16/2019. Mailed to pro se party Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. by certified mail with Certified Tracking Number: 70162070000006868966. (ts)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. (ca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Sue(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinzy v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Ashland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. McKinzy, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?