Dudley v. North Kansas City Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Terry M. Dudley
Defendant: North Kansas City Hospital, Beyonda Brown, William Fillipponi and Denise Nalley
Case Number: 2:2019cv02529
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 10/30/2019. Receipt number K4631058208, in the amount of $133.34. (ca)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING IN FULL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #4 Report and Recommendations. MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis(Doc 3) is denied; Motion terminated. Plaintiff is directed to make her first monthly installment of $133.34 on the filing fee on or before November 1, 2019. She then must make the two remaining payments of $133.33 each on or before December 1, 2019 and January 1, 2019. If plaintiff misses the first payment or any subsequent payments, her complaint will be subject to dismissal without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/30/2019.Mailed to pro se party Terry M. Dudley by regular mail (ydm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Terry M. Dudley.(hw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN Mail received re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS addressed to Terry M. Dudley. Not Remailed. (hw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/3/2019. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (amh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Terry M. Dudley (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Terry M. Dudley. (ca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Terry M. Dudley. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Sue)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. North Kansas City Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry M. Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Kansas City Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyonda Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fillipponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Nalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?