Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Feely's Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Feely's Service, LLC, William R. Feely and William W. Feely
Case Number: 2:2019cv02533
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Struby, Benjamin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/29/19. (hw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Benjamin C. Struby by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCRA Report re William R. Feely, #2 Exhibit SCRA Report re William W. Feely)(Struby, Benjamin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Struby, Benjamin)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Judgment (Doc. 11). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/21/2019. (mig)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Struby, Benjamin)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - On September 6, 2019, the court ordered plaintiff to show cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the Complaint failed to establish that diversity of citizenship exists here. Doc. 4. On September 19, 2019, plaintiff filed a Response to the court's show cause order. Doc. 9. Plaintiff also filed an Amended Complaint. Doc. 8. The Response and Amended Complaint sufficiently establish the citizenship of each party in this case. And the court finds that plaintiff has pleaded facts sufficient to allege diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Plaintiff thus has shown good cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation(Struby, Benjamin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Struby, Benjamin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation upon William W. Feely served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (Struby, Benjamin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation upon William R. Feely served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (Struby, Benjamin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation upon Feely's Service, LLC served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (Struby, Benjamin)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 9/6/19. (hw)
September 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to William W. Feely, William R. Feely, Feely's Service, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation identifying Caterpillar, Inc. as corporate parent . (Struby, Benjamin)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Struby, Benjamin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4911007.), filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Struby, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Feely's Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feely's Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Feely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Feely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin C. Struby
Represented By: Brian M. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?