Ford v. McCarthy
Plaintiff: Nancy Ford
Defendant: Ryan D McCarthy
Case Number: 2:2019cv02535
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan McCarthy United States Army Secretary of, United States Attorney and Attorney General. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (hw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Nancy Ford - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Rombold, Peter)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Nancy Ford - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Rombold, Peter)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 6, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number K4631058025. (ca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #2 Complaint, by Plaintiff Nancy Ford. (hw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Nancy Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C 1-5 Email Leave Req, #2 Exhibit C 6 Ford Appt Schedule, #3 Exhibit D 5 Ford Statement Rebecca Campbell, #4 Exhibit E 6 Ford Statement Jennifer Aguirre)(hw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 (PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Nancy Ford.(Rombold, Peter) Modified on 9/5/2019 (hw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ford
Represented By: Peter C. Rombold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?