Weatherspoon v. Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 299
Plaintiff: Vincent Weatherspoon
Defendant: USD 229 Blue Valley and Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 299
Case Number: 2:2019cv02542
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 299.(Seck, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vincent Weatherspoon. Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 299 waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Gockel, Marie)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4915212.), filed by Vincent Weatherspoon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gockel, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherspoon v. Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 299
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 229 Blue Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 299
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Weatherspoon
Represented By: Lynne J. Bratcher
Represented By: Marie L. Gockel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?