Barr et al v. Sedgwick County Area Educational Services Interlocal Cooperative 618
Plaintiff: Christopher Barr and Sierra Barr
Defendant: Sedgwick County Area Educational Services Interlocal Cooperative 618
Case Number: 2:2019cv02556
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 1/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/8/19. (alm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Sedgwick County Area Educational Services Interlocal Cooperative 618.(Tompkins, Katy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/04/2019 for Defendant Sedgwick County Area Educational Services Interlocal Cooperative 618 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/15/2019. (gw)
September 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sedgwick County Area Educational Services Interlocal Cooperative 618. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
September 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4919346.), filed by Christopher Barr, Sierra Barr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dove, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barr et al v. Sedgwick County Area Educational Services Interlocal Cooperative 618
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Barr
Represented By: Christopher S. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Barr
Represented By: Christopher S. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick County Area Educational Services Interlocal Cooperative 618
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?