Hunnell-Villines v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sheila Hunnell-Villines
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02581
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 24 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint /Petition by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Lohse, Catherine)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 fourth unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by November 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/12/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #21 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II Through V of Plaintiff's Complaint Brief by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(Lohse, Catherine)
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II Through V of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Lohse, Catherine)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lohse, Catherine)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 unopposed motion for extension of time until November 8, 2019, for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lohse, Catherine)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 unopposed motion for extension of time until October 31, 2019, for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (McCreary, Paige)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel K. Ryan for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel K. Ryan re #12 MOTION for attorney Daniel K. Ryan to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4942180.) by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(McCreary, Paige)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Daniel K. Ryan re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #12 by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(McCreary, Paige)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Daniel K. Ryan to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4942180.) by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (McCreary, Paige)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James M. Brodzik for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of James M. Brodzik re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(McCreary, Paige)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney James M. Brodzik to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4937469.) by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Leave)(McCreary, Paige)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Hartford Life, Inc. as corporate parent (McCreary, Paige)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal (with attachments) by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCreary, Paige)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 unopposed motion for extension of time until October 17, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (McCreary, Paige)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McCreary, Paige)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Paige L. McCreary on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (McCreary, Paige)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (McCreary, Paige)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County, case number 2019-CV-000691 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4930613.), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(McCreary, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunnell-Villines v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Paige L. McCreary
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Catherine Paige Lohse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Hunnell-Villines
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?