Williams v. ADT, LLC
Plaintiff: Tkara Williams
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02593
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Spring E. Taylor on behalf of ADT, LLC (Taylor, Spring)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 (TJJ) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 11/29/2019. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/7/2019. (mn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by ADT, LLC.(Ballew, Gregory)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/06/2019 for Defendant ADT, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/18/2019. (gw)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Gregory D. Ballew on behalf of ADT, LLC. (Ballew, Gregory)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Tkara Williams upon ADT, LLC served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019 (Stallworth, M.)
October 2, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADT, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Tkara Williams. (Stallworth, M.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4936549.), filed by Tkara Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stallworth, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. ADT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tkara Williams
Represented By: M. Shaun Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?