TAFS, Inc. v. Goode
Plaintiff: TAFS, Inc.
Defendant: Josh Goode and Joshua Goode
Case Number: 2:2019cv02597
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court hereby extends the deadline for Defendant to file his answer until January 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/26/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff TAFS, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Johnson, Shannon)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Brad K. Thoenen as to TAFS, Inc. (Thoenen, Brad)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint extended to 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/12/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Joshua Goode (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Lawrence, Erin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/12/2019 for Defendant Joshua Goode to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/24/2019. (ca)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Erin D. Lawrence on behalf of Joshua Goode. (Lawrence, Erin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Joshua Goode. (Boulware, Brandon)
October 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua Goode. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 3, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TAFS, Inc. identifying Jacobson Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Johnson, Shannon)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff TAFS, Inc.. (Johnson, Shannon)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4937572.), filed by TAFS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Employee Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Linkedin Page, #3 Exhibit C Linkedin Page, #4 Exhibit D Linkedin Page, #5 Exhibit E FactorSolve LLC Articles of Incorporation)(Johnson, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAFS, Inc. v. Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Goode
Represented By: Brandon J.B. Boulware
Represented By: Erin D. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAFS, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Cohorst Johnson
Represented By: Brad K. Thoenen
Represented By: Julie E. Parisi
Represented By: Brenda G. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?