Sedlock et al v. Overland Park Medical Investors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda Barnes and Lesa Sedlock
Defendant: Overland Park Medical Investors, LLC and Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02614
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lesa Sedlock, Linda Barnes.(Steele, Jonathan)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. On October 16, 2019, the court ordered plaintiffs to show cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the Complaint failed to establish that diversity of citizenship exists here. Doc. 5. On October 30, 2019, plaintiff filed a Response to the court's show cause order. Doc. 6. Plaintiffs' Response sufficiently alleges facts about the citizenship of each party in the case. And the court finds that plaintiff has alleged facts sufficient to allege diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Plaintiff thus has shown good cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Response also attaches a proposed Amended Complaint and seeks the court's leave to file it. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) directs the court to "freely give leave when justice so requires." Consistent with Rule 15(a)(2), the court grants plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Doc. #6 ). The court directs plaintiffs to file their Amended Complaint within five business days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Lesa Sedlock, Linda Barnes re: #5 Order to Show Cause, and MOTION to File an Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Draft Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Case, #3 Exhibit C, case, #4 Exhibit D, evidence of members)(Steele, Jonathan) (Modified on 10/30/2019 to reflect this is also a MOTION. (mg))
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs are directed to show cause within 14 days why the court should not dismiss plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1 ) without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/16/2019. (heo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jason P. Roth on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Roth, Jason)
October 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Overland Park Medical Investors, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw)
October 8, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Linda Barnes, Estate of Patricia Scott, Lesa Sedlock - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Linda Barnes, Estate of Patricia Scott, Lesa Sedlock. (Steele, Jonathan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4942223.), filed by Lesa Sedlock, Estate of Patricia Scott, Linda Barnes.(Steele, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sedlock et al v. Overland Park Medical Investors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overland Park Medical Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Barnes
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Represented By: Jason P. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesa Sedlock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Represented By: Jason P. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?