Bowers v. Law Office of Daniel E. Stuart, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Law Office of Daniel E. Stuart, P.A. and Daniel Stuart
Case Number: 2:2019cv02623
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/5/19. (ala)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint for Copyright Infringement by Law Office of Daniel E. Stuart, P.A., Daniel Stuart.(Boos, Brian)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric Bowers upon Law Office of Daniel E. Stuart, P.A. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 (Voytas, Richard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric Bowers upon Daniel Stuart served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 (Voytas, Richard)
November 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Law Office of Daniel E. Stuart, P.A., Daniel Stuart. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 11, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Voytas, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Eric Bowers - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Voytas, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Eric Bowers. (Voytas, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4947193.), filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Law Office of Daniel E. Stuart, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Daniel E. Stuart, P.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Craig
Represented By: Brian G. Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Stuart
Represented By: Jonathan Craig
Represented By: Brian G. Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?