Snyder et al v. Tamko Building Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lia Louthan, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder, Beth Melnick and Summerfield Gardens Condominium
Defendant: TAMKO Building Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02630
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 96 Letter to Counsel on record regarding transferred case from the Eastern District of California. (ydm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 95 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:15-cv-01892. Electronic case file and docket sheet received. (ydm)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/15/2019 TRANSFERRING this action to the US District Court for the District of Kansas. (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 93 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Transfer of Venue. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Painter, Charles) Modified on 10/15/2019 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/30/19 GRANTING #68 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Snyder's claims, without leave to amend. The Court defers ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as it relates to the other Plaintiffs unless and until it is determined that this Court is the proper venue for the remainder of this action. As such, Defendants are ordered to renotice such a Motion before this Court, if at all, not later than fourteen (14) days following issuance of an order confirming that venue is proper in this Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/6/2019: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Request for Status Conference (ECF No. #90 ). Plaintiffs' request is DENIED. The Court is aware that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #68 ) is still pending and hopes to have its decision filed shortly. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 90 REQUEST for Telephonic Status Conference by Lia Louthan, Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder, Summerfield Gardens Condominium. (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Richard Norman Sieving. (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Shanon J. Carson, PHV. (Carson, Shanon) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/29/18 DENYING #66 Motion to Strike. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/29/18 DENYING #81 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/3/2017: On the Court's own motion, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #81 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 8/10/2017 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 84 REPLY by Tamko Building Products, Inc. re #83 Opposition to Motion, #82 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #81 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kilopass Order)(Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 83 OPPOSITION by Lia Louthan, Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder, Summerfield Gardens Condominium to #81 Motion to Dismiss. (Polakoff, Jacob) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM by Tamko Building Products, Inc. in Supprt of #81 Motion to Dismiss. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 8, 2017 Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/8/2017: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' request for a telephonic status conference regarding the pending motions (ECF No. #79 ), and hereby DENIES Plaintiffs' request. The Court's heavy case load has made the submission times for pending motions longer than is customary. Please be assured that the Court is cognizant of the fact that this matter is still pending, and is deciding each matter in the order that they are filed. The Court hopes to have its decision filed as quickly as possible, and your patience in this matter is appreciated. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 8, 2017 Filing 79 REQUEST for Telephonic Status Conference by Lia Louthan, Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder, Summerfield Gardens Condominium. (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/14/2016: On the Court's own motion, Defendant's Motion to Strike and Dismiss (ECF Nos. #66 and #68 ) are hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 11/17/2016 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
November 10, 2016 Filing 77 REPLY by Tamko Building Products, Inc. re #72 Opposition to Motion, #66 Motion to Strike. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
November 10, 2016 Filing 76 REPLY by Tamko Building Products, Inc. re #73 Opposition to Motion, #68 Motion to Dismiss. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/7/2016 GRANTING #74 Motion to Extend Page Limits. Defendant Tamko is GRANTED leave to file a 20-page reply brief in support of #68 Motion to Dismiss. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
November 4, 2016 Filing 74 EXPEDITED MOTION to extend page limits for reply brief on 12(b)6 motion by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Painter, Charles) Modified on 11/7/2016 (Zignago, K.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
November 3, 2016 Filing 73 OPPOSITION by Lia Louthan, Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder, Summerfield Gardens Condominium to #68 Motion to Dismiss. (Polakoff, Jacob) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
November 3, 2016 Filing 72 OPPOSITION by Lia Louthan, Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder, Summerfield Gardens Condominium to #66 Motion to Strike. (Polakoff, Jacob) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/17/16 ORDERING that the hearing on both the #68 Motion to Dismiss and the #66 Motion to Strike is CONTINUED to 11/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Benson, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 70 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Pending Motion Hearings on Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Tamko Building Products, Inc. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 2, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE of MOTION HEARING #68 Partial Motion to Dismiss; hearing set for 11/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) Modified on 9/6/2016 (Kastilahn, A). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 2, 2016 Filing 68 PARTIAL MOTION to DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Painter, Charles) Modified on 9/6/2016 (Kastilahn, A). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 2, 2016 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM by Tamko Building Products, Inc. in SUPPORT of #66 MOTION to STRIKE . (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 2, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION to STRIKE by Tamko Building Products, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/19/2016 GRANTING Defendant's #62 Motion to Extend Page Limits. Defendant has permission to file a 60 page brief in support of its motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and to file a separate 20- page brief in support of its motion to strike Plaintiffs' class allegations. (Jackson, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 64 PROPOSED ORDER re Extend page limits for motion to dismiss / motion to strike. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM by Tamko Building Products, Inc. in SUPPORT of #62 MOTION to extend page limits for motion to dismiss / motion to strike. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 62 MOTION to extend page limits for motion to dismiss / motion to strike by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 22, 2016 Filing 61 PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Order Striking Defendant's Multiple Motions to Dismiss by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 07/21/2016 STRIKING Defendant's #42 , #44 , #46 , #48 and #50 Motions to Dismiss. The Court further DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiffs' #57 Motion For Leave to File Omnibus Response.(Streeter, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 20, 2016 Filing 59 REPLY by Tamko Building Products, Inc. re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Response to Defendant's Four Motions to Dismiss and For Relief from the Court's Page Limitation. (Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/21/2016 (Jackson, T) . [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 19, 2016 Filing 58 PROPOSED ORDER re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Response to Defendant's Four Motions to Dismiss and For Relief from the Court's Page Limitation (Polakoff, Jacob) Modified on 7/20/2016 (Jackson, T). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
July 19, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Response to Defendant's Four Motions to Dismiss and For Relief from the Court's Page Limitation re #48 MOTION to DISMISS, #42 MOTION to DISMISS, #46 MOTION to DISMISS, and #44 MOTION to DISMISS by Lia Louthan, Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder, Summerfield Gardens Condominium. (Polakoff, Jacob) Modified on 7/20/2016 (Jackson, T). Modified on 7/21/2016 (Streeter, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 56 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to strike re #50 MOTION to STRIKE, #51 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 55 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to dismiss re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #42 MOTION to DISMISS by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 54 PROPOSED ORDER re Moton to dismiss re #47 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #46 MOTION to DISMISS by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to Dismiss by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 52 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to Dismiss re #48 MOTION to DISMISS, #49 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM by Tamko Building Products, Inc. in SUPPORT of #50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 50 MOTION to STRIKE by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) Modified on 6/30/2016 (Kaminski, H). Modified on 7/21/2016 (Streeter, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM by Tamko Building Products, Inc. in SUPPORT of #48 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/5/2016 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION to DISMISS by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/21/2016 (Streeter, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM by Tamko Building Products, Inc. in SUPPORT of #46 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/5/2016 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 46 MOTION to DISMISS by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/21/2016 (Streeter, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM by Tamko Building Products, Inc. in SUPPORT of #44 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/5/2016 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION to DISMISS by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/21/2016 (Streeter, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM by Tamko Building Products, Inc. in SUPPORT of #42 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/5/2016 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION to DISMISS by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) Modified on 7/21/2016 (Streeter, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 41 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Tamko Building Products, Inc..(Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 27, 2016 Filing 40 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's time to Respond to Complaint by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/13/2016 ORDERING attorney Richard T. Bernardo ADDED for Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 13, 2016 Filing 38 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Tamko Building Products, Inc. for attorney Richard T. Bernardo to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6511428) (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
June 10, 2016 Filing 37 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 36 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tamko Building Products, Inc. by Jeffrey Snyder, Martin Melnick, Beth Melnick.(Polakoff, Jacob) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/6/2016 GRANTING the plaintiffs leave to file an amended complaint; CONTINUING the hearing on #24 Motion to Strike, #25 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING the defendant forty-five (45) days from the filing of the amended complaint to respond in writing to said amended complaint and file any motion; ORDERING the defendant to re-serve their motion(s) so as to give the plaintiffs not less than forty-five days to oppose the motion(s) in writing. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 34 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Filing of Amended Complaint and Time to Respond Thereto by Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Class Action Complaint)(Polakoff, Jacob) Modified on 5/6/2016 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 33 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Polakoff, Jacob) Modified on 4/18/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/11/2016 ORDERING that the Joint Status Report is to be filed on or before 4/15/2016. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
April 8, 2016 Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to file a Joint Status Report by Tamko Building Products, Inc. (Painter, Charles) Modified on 4/11/2016 (Michel, G.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 24, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Luke Gabriel Pears-Dickson on behalf of Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder. Attorney Pears-Dickson, Luke Gabriel added. (Pears-Dickson, Luke) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 14, 2016 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to Dismiss re May 19, 2016 hearing. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 14, 2016 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to Strike re May 19, 2016 hearing. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #24 MOTION to STRIKE Plaintiffs' Class Allegations : Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2016 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #25 MOTION to DISMISS : Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2016 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 1, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION to DISMISS by Tamko Building Products, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1) (Painter, Charles) Modified on 3/2/2016 (Jackson, T). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
March 1, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION to STRIKE Class Allegations by Tamko Building Products, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Painter, Charles) Modified on 3/2/2016 (Jackson, T). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/17/16. Added Attorney Jessica D. Miller, PHV for Tamko Building Products, Inc. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/17/16. Added Attorney John H. Beisner, PHV for Tamko Building Products, Inc. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
February 17, 2016 Filing 21 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Tamko Building Products, Inc. for attorney Jessica D. Miller to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6321401) (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
February 17, 2016 Filing 20 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Tamko Building Products, Inc. for attorney John Briesner to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6321365) (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. (Krueger, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/8/2016 REASSIGNING CASE 1:15-CV-1892 WBS SAB to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. Senior Judge William B. Shubb, Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 1:15-CV-1892 TLN KJN. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the decline to magistrate jurisdiction, the Status Conference/Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2016 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone is taken off calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/1/2016. (Hernandez, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
January 26, 2016 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE (Text Only): This case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge William B. Shubb and U.S. Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; the new case number is 1:15-cv-01892-WBS-SAB. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
January 22, 2016 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the decline to magistrate jurisdiction, the Clerk's office is instructed to randomly assign a Sacramento District Judge to this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/22/2016. (Hernandez, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
January 20, 2016 Filing 13 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
January 20, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:14-cv-01581 by Tamko Building Products, Inc.. Attorney Painter, Charles Stephen added. (Painter, Charles) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER re #9 Pro Hac Vice Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/12/16. Added attorney Charles E. Schaffer, PHV for Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, and Jeffrey Snyder. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
January 13, 2016 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Tamko Building Products, Inc. served on 1/12/2016, answer due 2/2/2016. (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
January 11, 2016 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder for attorney Charles E. Schaffer to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6257262) (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER and ORDER DENYING #4 Request for Class Action Designation as Unnecessary signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/29/2015. Added attorneys Lawrence Deutsch, PHV, Jacob M. Polakoff, PHV, Shanon J. Carson, PHV for Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder. (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 28, 2015 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder for attorney Shanon J. Carson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6238941) (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 28, 2015 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder for attorney Jacob M. Polakoff to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6238940) (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 28, 2015 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder for attorney Lawrence Deutsch to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6238939) (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 28, 2015 Filing 4 REQUEST for Class Action Designation by Beth Melnick, Martin Melnick, Jeffrey Snyder. (Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 21, 2015 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Status Conference re Consent / Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Order Assigning Action to Sac DJ, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 21, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tamko Building Products, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Norman Sieving* *The Sieving Law Firm A.P.C.* *100 Howe Ave Suite 220n* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 21, 2015 RECEIPT number 0972-6230007 for the amount of $400.00 paid on 12/18/15 by Richard Norman Sieving, fbo Jeffrey Snyder et al. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
December 18, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jeffrey Snyder, Martin Melnick, Beth Melnick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sieving, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder et al v. Tamko Building Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lia Louthan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summerfield Gardens Condominium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMKO Building Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?