Dobson v. Allergan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicolette Dobson
Defendant: Allergan, Inc., Allergan PLC and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02633
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Personal Service upon Allergan USA, Inc. served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ydm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. As previously ordered, all proceedings in this matter are stayed pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JMPL") on the pending motion to transfer. In light of the pending JPML motion, defendant Allergan USA, Inc.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to 30 days after the earliest of either 1) the date the JPML enters an order denying the motion to transfer; or 2) the JPML grants the motion to transfer and Plaintiff files an amended consolidation complaint, unless the MDL judge sets a different schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/12/19. (adc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for extension of time To Set Response Deadlines by Defendant Allergan USA, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Muehlberger, James)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Nicolette Dobson upon Allergan, Inc. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019 Return of Service - Allergan, Inc. (Dameron, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting the parties' #3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and to Set Answer Deadline. All proceedings in this matter are stayed pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JMPL") on thepending motion to transfer. In light of the pending JPML motion, defendant Allergan, Inc.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to 30 days after the earliest of either 1) the date the JPML enters an order denying the motion to transfer; or 2) the JPML grants the motion to transfer and Plaintiff files an amended consolidation complaint, unless the MDL judge sets a different schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for extension of time and to Set Response Deadlines by Defendant Allergan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Muehlberger, James)
October 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw)
October 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Nicolette Dobson. (Dameron, Matthew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4949306.), filed by Nicolette Dobson.(Dameron, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobson v. Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolette Dobson
Represented By: Michael A. Williams
Represented By: Matthew L. Dameron
Represented By: Mandy M. Shell
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: James P. Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: James P. Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?