Kelly v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hope Kelly
Defendant: Cenlar FSB, Equifax Information Services LLC, Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02652
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cenlar FSB identifying Cenlar Capital Corporation as corporate parent . (Hoffman, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent . (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mouber, Bryan)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Eric A. Nicholson as counsel for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/11/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Mouber, Bryan)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. Deadline for Equifax Information Services LLC to respond is extended to 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/11/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Eric A. Nicholson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5004392.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Webb, Danne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Experian PLC as corporate parent to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Webb, Danne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Webb, Danne)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. Response of Cenlar FSB due on or before 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Cenlar FSB. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Hoffman, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Hope Kelly upon Cenlar FSB served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019 (Callahan, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Hope Kelly upon Trans Union LLC served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019 (Callahan, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Hope Kelly upon Equifax Information Services LLC served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019 (Callahan, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Hope Kelly upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019 (Callahan, Ryan)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Anthony P. Chester as counsel for Hope Kelly pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/29/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Anthony P. Chester to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4964549.) by Plaintiff Hope Kelly (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Callahan, Ryan)
October 23, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cenlar FSB, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Trans Union LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Hope Anne Kelly - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Callahan, Ryan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Hope Anne Kelly. (Callahan, Ryan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4957867.), filed by Hope Anne Kelly.(Callahan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Robert J. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Guillermo Gabriel Zorogastua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Represented By: James Scott Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea S. McMurtry
Represented By: Eric A. Nicholson
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Kelly
Represented By: James Crump
Represented By: Ryan M. Callahan
Represented By: Anthony P. Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?