Eichhorn-Burkhard v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02672
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference (32 pgs) held 12/11/2019 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Thomas Schult. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (ks)
December 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: This case is hereby stayed for all purposes except briefing on the issue of coordination and/or consolidation with the MDL until further notice from the Court. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/11/2019. (bw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/11/2019. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER and NOTICE OF SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephonic status conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(bw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Please disregard #12 Status Conference as it was inadvertently filed this case. Original has been blocked from public view and this annotation has been filed for noticing purposes only. (bw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 DISREGARD THIS ENTRY - INCORRECTLY FILED IN THIS CASE. MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/18/2019. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw) Modified on 11/18/2019 (bw).
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #4 Order, (Stipulation Agreeing to Transfer) by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Schult, Thomas)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #4 Order. For good cause shown, the parties' deadline to file any notice of related case or stipulation agreeing to the inclusion of this case in MDL No. 2887, In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, is extended to November 14, 2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on November 8, 2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 Order, by Defendants Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Schult, Thomas)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ari Y. Basser for Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ivy T. Ngo for Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jordan L. Lurie for Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Jordan L. Lurie to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4971962.) by Plaintiff Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Back, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Ivy T. Ngo to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4971941.) by Plaintiff Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Back, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Ari Y. Basser to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4971887.) by Plaintiff Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Back, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 23-A, the parties shall file any notice of related case, or a stipulation signed by all parties agreeing to the inclusion of this case in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings, no later than seven calendar days from the date of this Order, or by November 7, 2019. The parties only need file any notice of related case or stipulation in this individual action. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/31/2019. (bw)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Back, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard. (Back, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4966170.), filed by Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard. (Back, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eichhorn-Burkhard v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard
Represented By: Daniel K. Back
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: Ari Y. Basser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?