Barnett v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Cecil Barnett, Jr.
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 2:2019cv02675
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal Service (USM 285) on 11/13/2019 Summons served on United States Attorney General. (ca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail (USM 285) on 11/12/2019 Summons served on Office of the Regional Counsel. (ca)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal Service (USM 285) on 11/6/2019 Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Summons served on United States Attorney. (ca)
November 5, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal USM 285 for service) (ca)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/05/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Cecil Barnett, Jr (Green, James) #1 Affidavit) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct docket event wording (ca).
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Cecil Barnett, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PAUPERIS, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Green, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 **DISREGARD - SEE CORRECT FILING DE 2** COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Cecil Barnett, Jr.(Green, James) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Barnett, Jr.
Represented By: James H. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?