Newton v. Cereal Ingredients, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erica Newton
Defendant: Cereal Ingredients, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02704
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 2/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/8/2020. (hw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Cereal Ingredients, Inc. (Packel, Eric)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/26/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/3/2019. (ht)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Cereal Ingredients, Inc..(Packel, Eric)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/21/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Cereal Ingredients, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Packel, Eric)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal by Cereal Ingredients, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Packel, Eric)
November 14, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cereal Ingredients, Inc. . (Packel, Eric)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Cereal Ingredients, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Packel, Eric)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Cereal Ingredients, Inc.. (Packel, Eric)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000771 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4981312.), filed by Cereal Ingredients, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Packel, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Cereal Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cereal Ingredients, Inc.
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Newton
Represented By: Daniel L. Doyle
Represented By: Robert A. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?