Olcott v. QuikTrip Corporation
Plaintiff: Jeannine L. Olcott
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02717
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: J Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Jeannine L. Olcott. (Napolitano, Christopher)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered, as agreed to by the parties, limiting the disclosure, dissemination, and use of certain identified categories of confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/14/2020. (ts)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC. The court hereby amends the final page of its prior Order (Dkt. #19 ), substituting "Count 2" for "Count 1," and directs the Clerk of the Court to clarify on the docket that the Order dismisses only Count 2 of the original Petition. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/14/2020. (jk)
January 14, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule 26(a)(1)(A) by QuikTrip Corporation. (Nye, Brian)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #6 Motion for Judgment; denying #13 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. The Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss Count 1 of the original Petition. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/13/2020. (sz)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant QuikTrip Corporation re: #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Nye, Brian)
January 8, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jeannine L. Olcott re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Napolitano, Christopher)
December 31, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Jeannine L. Olcott re: #13 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Out of Time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ensz, James)
December 24, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of QT's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff by QuikTrip Corporation. (Nye, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Defendant QuikTrip Corporation re #13 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Out of Time (Nye, Brian)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Out of Time by Plaintiff Jeannine L. Olcott (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ensz, James)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #6 Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff shall file her response before 1/8/2020. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/18/2019. (mam)
December 17, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Jeannine L. Olcott (Napolitano, Christopher)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Isaac Elyacharshuster on behalf of Jeannine L. Olcott (Elyacharshuster, Isaac)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/31/2019. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 1/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/2/2019. (ts)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant QuikTrip Corporation(Nye, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant QuikTrip Corporation (Nye, Brian)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Proof of Filing in State Court by QuikTrip Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nye, Brian)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QuikTrip Corporation . (Nye, Brian)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant QuikTrip Corporation - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Nye, Brian)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant QuikTrip Corporation. (Nye, Brian)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County District Court, case number 19cv05747 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4988995.), filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nye, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olcott v. QuikTrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Represented By: Karrie J. Clinkinbeard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine L. Olcott
Represented By: Christopher M. Napolitano
Represented By: James H. Ensz
Represented By: Isaac Elyacharshuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?