Summers v. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Debbie Summers
Defendant: Jones Lang Lasalle, Inc. and Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02720
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/10/20. (aw)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's 1st Interrogatories and 1st Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 03:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 to participate on the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 1/29/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/29/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/20/19. (aw)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Margaret K. Young on behalf of Jones Lang Lasalle, Inc. (Young, Margaret)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Jones Lang Lasalle, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Johnson, Daniel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jones Lang Lasalle, Inc. identifying Jones Lang LaSalle Incorporated as corporate parent (as Defendant should be Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.). (Johnson, Daniel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Jones Lang Lasalle, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Debbie Summers upon Jones Lang Lasalle, Inc. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019 (Middleton, Marc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Debbie Summers. (Stiles, Megan)
November 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jones Lang Lasalle, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Debbie Summers. (Middleton, Marc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4989950.), filed by Debbie Summers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Middleton, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers v. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Lang Lasalle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Johnson
Represented By: Margaret K. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Summers
Represented By: Megan Lowe Stiles
Represented By: Marc N. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?