Patel v. CCS Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Girish Patel and Gary Patel
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and CCS Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02721
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of B. Andrew Pike for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Experian plc as corporate parent (Webb, Danne)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Experian is granted an extension of time, to and including January 22, 2020, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney B. Andrew Pike to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5011682.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Webb, Danne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Webb, Danne)
November 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CCS Financial Services, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Girish Patel - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Esselman, Andrew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Girish Patel. (Esselman, Andrew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4990329.), filed by Girish Patel.(Esselman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. CCS Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Girish Patel
Represented By: Andrew M. Esselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Patel
Represented By: Andrew M. Esselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: B. Andrew Pike
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?