Youngblood v. National Bank Holdings Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jarred Youngblood
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC, National Bank Holdings Corporation and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02728
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Trans Union, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mouber, Bryan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Mouber, Bryan)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 National Bank Holdings Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which NBH Bank May File Its Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant NBH Bank's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to January 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant National Bank Holdings Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Baker, James)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Experian plc as corporate parent (Webb, Danne)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is hereby granted an extension of time, to and including January 27, 2020, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of B. Andrew Pike for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/19/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney B. Andrew Pike to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5011700.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration)(Webb, Danne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Webb, Danne)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/9/2020 for Defendant Trans Union, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/17/19. (smc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jarred Youngblood upon Trans Union, LLC served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Knipp, Ryan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jarred Youngblood upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Knipp, Ryan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jarred Youngblood upon National Bank Holdings Corporation served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Knipp, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., National Bank Holdings Corporation, Trans Union, LLC. (Issued to Attorney for service.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 27, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jarred Youngblood. (Knipp, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4993642.), filed by Jarred Youngblood.(Knipp, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youngblood v. National Bank Holdings Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: James Scott Kreamer
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bank Holdings Corporation
Represented By: James L. Baker
Represented By: Bruce Edwin Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: B. Andrew Pike
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarred Youngblood
Represented By: Ryan D. Knipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?