Ragan Jr. v. Speedway Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc. Et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Ragan Jr.
Defendant: Speedway Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc, Brice Ackerman, Douglas Kinney and Daniel Frederick Ladd
Case Number: 2:2019cv02754
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ydm)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Ronald Ragan Jr. WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Caldwell, Kenneth)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/7/2020 for Defendant Speedway Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/21/2020. (ca)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patrick D. Kuehl, Jr on behalf of Speedway Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc (Kuehl, Patrick)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ronald Ragan Jr. upon Speedway Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020 (Caldwell, Kenneth)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Ronald Ragan Jr. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Caldwell, Kenneth)
December 12, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brice Ackerman, Douglas Kinney, Daniel Frederick Ladd, Speedway Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Ronald Ragan Jr.. (Caldwell, Kenneth)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Caldwell, Kenneth)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5005834.), filed by Ronald Ragan Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright)(Caldwell, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragan Jr. v. Speedway Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc. Et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ragan Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth N. Caldwell
Represented By: Edward N. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc
Represented By: Patrick D. Kuehl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brice Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Frederick Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?