Eckel v. Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC
Plaintiff: Judith Eckel
Defendant: Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02762
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/13/2020. (aw)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/25/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/25/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/21/20. (aw)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Merrill, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth D. Moeller on behalf of Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC (Moeller, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew M. Merrill on behalf of Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC (Merrill, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC.(Merrill, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Judith Eckel. (Williams, Brett)
December 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5009053.), filed by Judith L Eckel.(Williams, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckel v. Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmar Gardens of Overland Park Operating, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Moeller
Represented By: Matthew M. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Eckel
Represented By: Brett A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?