United States of America v. Kaeckell
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Kelly V. Kaeckell
Case Number: 2:2019mc00209
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 9 Order on Motion to Enforce IRS Summons mailed to Kelly Kaeckell on 7/3/2019 by regular mail. (ss)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 7/3/2019.(Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The undersigned magistrate judge conducted a hearing today in open court with regard to this IRS summons-enforcement proceeding. After hearing from both parties with regard to the factual and legal issues presented by their various written submissions (ECF Nos. 5-8), the Government's underlying motion (ECF No. #1 ) was taken after advisement. The record, however, was left open until 7/8/19 for the parties to file any supplemental factual declarations or legal briefs they deem pertinent, provided they are strictly limited to the discrete issues raised during the hearing; as discussed on the record, the court will favorably entertain a motion for a reasonable extension of this deadline if the IRS needs to retrieve documents relevant to confirming that certain notices were sent to defendant by certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/3/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 Objection(s) by Kelly Kaeckell to "Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment" by Movant United States of America. (Allman, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION(S) to Plaintiff's Request for Summary Judgment by Kelly V. Kaeckell. (hw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Movant United States of America re: #1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons (Allman, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE (Titled: Answer to Complaint) by Respondent Kelly V. Kaeckell re #1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons . (hw)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service (USM 285) by United States of America upon Kelly V. Kaeckell served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (ca)
May 9, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kelly V. Kaeckell. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/9/19. (hw)
May 7, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Movant United States of America, The. (Allman, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons by Movant United States of America, The (Allman, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATED by Christopher Allman on behalf of United States of America, The. See motion immediately following this entry for details. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. filed by on behalf of United States of America, The.(Allman, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kaeckell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly V. Kaeckell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?