Williams v. Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC
Plaintiff: Davonne Walker Williams
Defendant: Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02039
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 22 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/20/2020. Mailed to pro se party Davonne Walker Williams by regular mail. (smc)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the court dismisses this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction but without prejudice to refiling. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 3/20/2020. Mailed to pro se party Davonne Walker Williams by regular mail. (smc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Davonne Walker Williams re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM .(smc)
March 6, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Hoffman, Robert)
March 3, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC. (Hoffman, Robert)
March 2, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN Mail addressed to Davonne Walker Williams re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (hw)
March 2, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 Order to Show Cause. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (jc)
February 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Supplement Response as to #9 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Davonne Walker Williams . (smc)
February 29, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Davonne Walker Williams re #9 Order to Show Cause.(smc) Modified to change link and title per chambers on 3/3/2020 (smc).
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC(Hoffman, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 3/11/2020) by Defendant Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC (Hoffman, Robert)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM 285) by Davonne Walker Williams upon Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (ca)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #9 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff has until February 29, 2020 to show cause why the court should not dismiss the action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 2/6/2020. (smc)
January 31, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #10 MOTION for extension of time. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to respond to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Davonne Walker Williams. (smc) (Modified on 2/5/2020 to correct motion event. (heo))
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 1/29/2020. Mailed to pro se party Davonne Walker Williams by regular mail. (hw)
January 24, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC. (issued to US Marshal (USM 285) for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/24/2020. Mailed to pro se party Davonne Walker Williams by regular and certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70180680000181741479. (smc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION: An incorrect document was originally attached to #6 Order. The correct PDF document of #6 Order on MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (smc) Modified text on 1/27/2020 (smc).
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/24/2020. Mailed to pro se party Davonne Walker Williams by regular and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 70180680000181741479. (smc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2020: #1 Main Document (Correct)) (smc). Modified to block original document from public view, incorrect document was attached on 1/24/2020 (smc).
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Davonne Walker Williams is a registered pro se participant with ECF Notifications Only. (gw)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Davonne Walker Williams (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (ca)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Davonne Walker Williams (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Davonne Walker Williams. (ca)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Davonne Walker Williams.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davonne Walker Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince & Associates Clinical Research, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?