Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC, Lansing Grain Co., Anderson, Inc., The and Lansing Vermont, Inc.
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, BNSF Railway Company and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02046
Filed: February 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically opened in the District of Columbia (20-00522). (hw)
February 24, 2020 Case transferred to District of Columbia (MDL 2925).(hw)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred District Court for the District of Columbia (MDL 2925). ***Terminating Case. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/24/2020. (hw)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anderson, Inc., The, Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC. CSX Transportation, Inc. waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (May, Kirk)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anderson, Inc., The, Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC. BNSF Railway Company waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (May, Kirk)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Anderson, Inc., The, Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (May, Kirk)
February 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 3, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC, The Andersons, Inc.. (May, Kirk)
February 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5047881.), filed by The Andersons, Inc., Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC.(May, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lansing Trade Group, LLC.
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lansing-Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lansing Grain Co.
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson, Inc., The
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lansing Vermont, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?