Cole v. Lanier
Plaintiff: Sylvia P. Cole
Defendant: Kendall Lanier
Case Number: 2:2020cv02080
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/21/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/21/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/15/20. (aw)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Kendall Lanier.(Wnuk, Christopher)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Sylvia P. Cole upon All Defendants (Foster, Michael)
March 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kendall Lanier. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
February 25, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Sylvia P Cole - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Foster, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Sylvia P Cole. (Foster, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5071203.), filed by Sylvia P Cole.(Foster, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia P. Cole
Represented By: Brendan C. Buckley
Represented By: Michael S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Lanier
Represented By: Christopher J. Wnuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?