Gott v. Mylan N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Troy Gott
Defendant: Mylan Specialty L.P., Mylan N.V., Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc. and Pfizer Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02099
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #16 Notice of Dismissal/EFM chambers. (mam)
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Troy Gott (Sharp, Rex)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion by All Defendants for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. All Defendants are hereby granted an extension of time in which to answer or otherwise respond to #4 Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint. The deadline is extended to the later of (1) June 15, 2020, or (2) 30 days after District Judge Crabtree rules on the Motion to Consolidate (ECF No. 2040) pending in Case No. 2:17-md-02785-DDC-TJJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
April 14, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint - Unopposed Motion by All Defendants for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint - by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Specialty L.P. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Fries, Brian)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Troy Gott upon Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc. served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020 (Hudson, Ryan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Troy Gott upon Pfizer Inc. served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020 (Hudson, Ryan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Troy Gott upon Mylan N.V. served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020 (Hudson, Ryan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Troy Gott upon Mylan Specialty L.P. served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020 (Hudson, Ryan)
April 6, 2020 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pfizer Inc. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Transfer and Consolidate the Gott Case to the EpiPen MDL by Troy Gott re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Sharp, Rex)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by Rex A. Sharp (Sharp, Rex)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases - Mylan Defendants and Pfizer Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Transfer and Consolidate the Gott Case to the EpiPen MDL - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Mylan, #2 Exhibit B - Class Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Pfizer Defendants, #3 Exhibit C - Mylan's Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit D - Pfizer Defendants' Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #5 Exhibit E - Letter from A. Chase to Mylan, #6 Exhibit F - Letter from A. Chase to Pfizer, #7 Exhibit G - Aug. 7, 2018 Draft 30(b)(6) Notice)(Fries, Brian)
March 30, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 25, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mylan N.V., Mylan Specialty L.P. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 17, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Troy Gott (Sharp, Rex)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren for all further proceedings. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/09/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Troy Gott.(Sharp, Rex)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Troy Gott - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Sharp, Rex)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Troy Gott. (Sharp, Rex)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5079974.), filed by Troy Gott.(Sharp, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gott v. Mylan N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Specialty L.P.
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Gott
Represented By: Ryan C. Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?