Seawell v. Konza Prairie Pizza, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Christina Marie Seawell
Defendant: Jeffrey Maddox and Konza Prairie Pizza, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02130
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Meredith Black-Mathews for Christina Marie Seawell pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Meredith Black-Mathews to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5141966.) by Plaintiff Christina Marie Seawell (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Paul, Richard)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Marie Seawell. Jeffrey Maddox waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Fellows, Laura)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Marie Seawell. Konza Prairie Pizza, Inc. waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Fellows, Laura)
March 19, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Konza Prairie Pizza, Inc, Jeffrey Maddox. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 19, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff CHRISTINA MARIE SEAWELL - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Paul, Richard)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff CHRISTINA MARIE SEAWELL. (Paul, Richard)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5094455.), filed by CHRISTINA MARIE SEAWELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seawell v. Konza Prairie Pizza, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Marie Seawell
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Meredith Black-Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konza Prairie Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?