Komm v. Long
Plaintiff: Michelle Komm
Defendant: Alec Long
Case Number: 2:2020cv02166
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PHASE I SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant file Joint Mediation Notice by 9/25/2020. Mediation Discovery deadline 10/2/2020. Mediation deadline 10/16/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 440 before District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/27/2020. (rel)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of all notices and filings with Johnson County by Alec Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchanan, David)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Michelle Komm (Stewart, Chad)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Alec Long. (Buchanan, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Alec Long. (Buchanan, David)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/3/20. (ala)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to the State Court Petition by Alec Long. (Originally filed in the Johnson County District Court on 3/16/2020.) (mam)
March 31, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Alec Long of all notices and filings with Johnson County (Buchanan, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. (Buchanan, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alec Long identifying None as corporate parent . (Buchanan, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Alec Long. (Buchanan, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas; case number 20CV01009; trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5104039.), filed by Alec Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buchanan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komm v. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Komm
Represented By: Chad A. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec Long
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Represented By: Jared Michael Becker, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?