Lightner et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Matthew Bock and Melissa Lightner
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02174
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held by telephone on 5/26/2020. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 5/26/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. (mn)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing (TIME CHANGE ONLY): THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Upon the Court's own motion and with approval of counsel the Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2020 is rescheduled to 9:00 AM by telephone. Please dial 888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. (ck)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Matthew Bock, Melissa Lightner (Roller, Kana)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Moothart, Bruce)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Moothart, Bruce)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 10:15 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 4/30/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/9/2020. (mn)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Moothart, Bruce)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Safeco Corporation as corporate parent (Moothart, Bruce)
April 1, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bruce A. Moothart on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (Moothart, Bruce)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Moothart, Bruce)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Moothart, Bruce)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Douglas County, Kansas District Court, case number 2020-CV-000044 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5105413.), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court file, #2 Exhibit B - Daugherty Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court)(Moothart, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightner et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Nicholas Rex Daugherty
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bock
Represented By: Kana R. Roller
Represented By: Thomas D. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Lightner
Represented By: Kana R. Roller
Represented By: Thomas D. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?