United Specialty Insurance Company v. Sethmar Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Sethmar Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02234
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Specialty Insurance Company identifying State National Insurance Companies, Inc as corporate parent . (Kenny, Patrick)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Kenny, Patrick)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sethmar Transportation, Inc.'s answer now due 7/6/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Sethmar Transportation, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Gasper, Adam)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by United Specialty Insurance Company upon Sethmar Transportation, Inc. served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020 (Bascom, Kathryn)
May 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sethmar Transportation, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn C. Bascom on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company. (Bascom, Kathryn)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kenny, Patrick)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company. (Kenny, Patrick)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5134594.), filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sunshine Mills Second Amended Answer)(Kenny, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Specialty Insurance Company v. Sethmar Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sethmar Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathryn C. Bascom
Represented By: Patrick J Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?