Philpot v. Rocking M Media, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Rocking M Media, LLC and Meridian Media, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02236
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/13/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 7/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/16/2020. (ts)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Meridian Media, LLC, Rocking M Media, LLC.(Hammond, Thomas)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/15/2020 for Defendants Meridian Media, LLC, Rocking M Media, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/29/2020. (ca)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas E. Hammond, II on behalf of All Defendants. (Hammond, Thomas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Larry G. Philpot upon Meridian Media, LLC served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020 (Hertenstein, Luke)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Larry G. Philpot upon Rocking M Media, LLC served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020 (Hertenstein, Luke)
May 7, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Meridian Media, LLC, Rocking M Media, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 7, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Hertenstein, Luke)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Hertenstein, Luke)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5136781.), filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Hertenstein, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Rocking M Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Luke R. Hertenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocking M Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?