Dorfman v. MGP Ingredients, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mitchell Dorfman
Defendant: Augustus C. Griffin, Terrence P. Dunn, James L. Bareuther, George W. Page, Anthony P. Foglio, Lynn H. Jenkins, Thomas K. Pigott, MGP Ingredients, Inc., Karen L. Seaberg, David J. Colo, M. Jeannine Strandjord and Brandon M. Gall
Case Number: 2:2020cv02239
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mitchell Dorfman. All Defendants. (LaPointe, Brent)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy W. Brown for Mitchell Dorfman pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Phillip Kim for Mitchell Dorfman pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Timothy W. Brown to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5142881.) by Plaintiff Mitchell Dorfman (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(LaPointe, Brent)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Phillip Kim to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5142873.) by Plaintiff Mitchell Dorfman (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(LaPointe, Brent)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. Signed on 5/14/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Broomes no longer assigned to case. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 05/12/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jmr)
May 12, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff MITCHELL DORFMAN. (LaPointe, Brent)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5138968.), filed by MITCHELL DORFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A- Designation of Place of Trial)(LaPointe, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorfman v. MGP Ingredients, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augustus C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence P. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Bareuther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony P. Foglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn H. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas K. Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGP Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Seaberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Colo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jeannine Strandjord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon M. Gall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Dorfman
Represented By: Brent LaPointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?