Velayo v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Velayo
Defendant: Kimberly Grant and Cheryl Fox
Case Number: 2:2020cv02279
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #15 Amended Notice of Appeal ( Appeal No. 20-3143). (Attachments: #1 Amended Preliminary Packet)(smc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment by Benjamin Velayo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(smc)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of 10CCA: On or before August 5, 2020, the appellant must file an amended notice of appeal in the district court that contains his personal signature. ( Appeal No. 20-3143) (smc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 7/15/2020 and assigned Appeal No. 20-3143 re #10 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Benjamin Velayo. (smc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #10 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet)(smc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. NOTE Access to document is restricted pursuant to the Courts privacy policy by Plaintiff Benjamin Velayo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(smc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Memorandum & Order and #9 Judgment by Plaintiff Benjamin Velayo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(smc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/6/2020. Mailed to pro se party Benjamin Velayo by regular mail. (hw)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff's Civil Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 7/6/2020. Mailed to pro se party Benjamin Velayo by regular mail. (hw)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Benjamin Velayo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hw)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 Order to Show Cause addressed to Benjamin Velayo. (smc)
June 5, 2020 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #5 Order to Show Cause mailed to Benjamin Velayo at 1339 Stonleigh Ct. Apt. C Leavenworth, KS 66048 on 6/5/2020 by certified mail and regular mail ; Certified Tracking Number 70180680000181741523. (smc)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The court respectfully denies plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel #4 . Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by June 18, 2020, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/4/2020. Mailed to pro se party Benjamin Velayo by regular and certified mail. (hw)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Benjamin Velayo (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (ca)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Benjamin Velayo (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Benjamin Velayo. (ca)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Benjamin Velayo.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velayo v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Velayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?