Shophar v. Johnson County Kansas et al
Plaintiff: Jorel Shophar
Defendant: Krissy Gorski, Christina Gyllenborg and Johnson County, Kansas
Case Number: 2:2020cv02280
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Jorel Shophar upon Krissy Gorski served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (smc)
July 27, 2020 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Krissy Gorski. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by Jorel Shophar as to Krissy Gorski. (smc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Jorel Shophar upon Johnson County, Kansas served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (smc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Jorel Shophar upon Christina Gyllenborg served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (smc)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/17/2020 for Defendant Christina Gyllenborg to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/21/2020. Mailed to pro se party Jorel Shophar by regular mail (ca)
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jorel Shophar. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (smc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Service (titled Motion for U.S. Marshal Service upon Respondents) by Plaintiff Jorel Shophar. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (smc)
July 1, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Krissy Gorski, Christina Gyllenborg, Johnson County, Kansas. (Returned to plaintiff via regular mail for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Originally filed in Illinois Northern on 6/16/2020, transferred to District of Kansas) against Krissy Gorski, Christina Gyllenborg, Johnson County, Kansas, filed by Jorel Shophar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(smc)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE from Illinois Northern forwarding documents to District of Kansas. (smc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03170. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSFERRED to the District of Kansas the electronic record. (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/4/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:This case is transferred to the District of Kansas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) or, in the alternative, 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk shall effectuate the transfer forthwith. Civil case transferred.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/4/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/4/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 PAYMENT received but not yet processed. (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/4/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/4/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and 1 copy filed by Jorel Shophar (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/4/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shophar v. Johnson County Kansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorel Shophar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krissy Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Gyllenborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?