Weldemariam v. Branch Banking & Trust Co.
Plaintiff: Nadew A. Weldemariam
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Co.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02301
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response deadline 8/31/2020. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 08/10/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Nadew A. Weldemariam (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Scott, Charles)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Branch Banking & Trust Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment)(Nichols, Justin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Branch Banking & Trust Co. (Nichols, Justin)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition. Defendant is granted an extension of time, to and including July 20, 2020, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition (ECF No. 1-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Branch Banking & Trust Co. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Nichols, Justin)
June 19, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Justin M. Nichols on behalf of Branch Banking & Trust Co. (Nichols, Justin)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Edward Shaw on behalf of BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST CO. (Shaw, Ryan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST CO. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Nichols, Justin)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST CO.. (Nichols, Justin)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2020-CV000291 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5173629.), filed by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C - Record Information from North Carolina Secretary of State)(Nichols, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weldemariam v. Branch Banking & Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Co.
Represented By: Ryan Edward Shaw
Represented By: Justin M. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadew A. Weldemariam
Represented By: Charles S. Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?