Kramer v. Textron Aviation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fran Kramer
Defendant: John Does 1-10, ACS Products Company and Textron Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02341
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Fran Kramer re #6 MOTION for Order to Designate Wichita as the Place of Trial (Watkins, Diane)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Pursuant to the #9 Stipulation filed by Fran Kramer, Defendant ACS Products Company's answer or other responsive pleading is due no later than 9/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/11/20. (adc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant ACS Products Company to File Responsive Pleading by Fran Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cartmell, Thomas)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Textron Aviation, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Preheim, Lynn)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION for Order to Designate Wichita as the Place of Trial by Defendant Textron Aviation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Preheim Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Map TAI to KC USDC, #3 Exhibit 3 - Map TAI to ICT USDC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Map FL to KC USDC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Map FL to ICT USDC)(Preheim, Lynn)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Designate Wichita as the Place of Trial by Defendant Textron Aviation, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Preheim, Lynn)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Textron Aviation, Inc..(Preheim, Lynn)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Fran Kramer upon Textron Aviation, Inc. served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020 (Cartmell, Thomas)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Fran Kramer upon ACS Products Company served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020 (Cartmell, Thomas)
July 8, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACS Products Company, Textron Aviation, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Fran Kramer. (Cartmell, Thomas)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5191233.), filed by Fran Kramer.(Cartmell, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer v. Textron Aviation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn D. Preheim
Represented By: Christina J. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Kramer
Represented By: Diane Watkins
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?