Billings v. Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC et al
Plaintiff: Henry Ed Billings
Defendant: HCR Manorcare Services, LLC, Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC, ProMedica Health System, Inc, Centers for Care, LLC, Wichita Operations Associates, LLC, HCR Healthcare, LLC and HCR ManorCare, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02357
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 32 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Centers for Care, LLC, Wichita Operations Associates, LLC. (Acosta, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 31 Separate ANSWER to Complaint by Wichita Operations Associates, LLC.(Acosta, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 30 Separate ANSWER to Complaint by Centers for Care, LLC.(Acosta, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Corso for HCR Healthcare, LLC, HCR ManorCare, Inc., HCR Manorcare Services, LLC, Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC, and ProMedica Health System, Inc pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only; granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Bootier for HCR Healthcare, LLC, HCR ManorCare, Inc., HCR Manorcare Services, LLC, Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC, and ProMedica Health System, Inc pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
September 3, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Michael W. Bootier to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5247180.) by Defendant Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McDonald, Ted)
September 3, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for attorney Matthew Thomas Corso to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5247165.) by Defendant Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McDonald, Ted)
August 27, 2020 Filing 26 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Barbara K. Christopher on behalf of Centers for Care, LLC, Wichita Operations Associates, LLC. (Christopher, Barbara)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Answers shall be filed in form attached to motion on or before September 9, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
August 26, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Ed Billings upon ProMedica Health System, Inc served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Ed Billings upon Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Ed Billings upon HCR ManorCare, Inc. served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Ed Billings upon HCR Manorcare Services, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Ed Billings upon HCR Healthcare, LLC served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Ed Billings upon Centers for Care, LLC served on 8/1/2020, answer due 9/10/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Ed Billings upon Wichita Operations Associates, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Answers to Complaint Out of Time by Defendants Centers for Care, LLC, Wichita Operations Associates, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B- Wichita Operations Associates, LLC's Proposed Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Centers for Care, LLC's Proposed Answer to Complaint)(Acosta, Richard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/10/2020 for Defendant Centers for Care, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/26/2020. (ca)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint. By agreement of Plaintiff, movants shall have until 9/9/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/25/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Defendant Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McDonald, Ted)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC (McDonald, Ted)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Defendant ProMedica Health System, Inc (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McDonald, Ted)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of ProMedica Health System, Inc (McDonald, Ted)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Defendant HCR ManorCare, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McDonald, Ted)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of HCR ManorCare, Inc. (McDonald, Ted)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Defendant HCR Healthcare, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McDonald, Ted)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of HCR Healthcare, LLC (McDonald, Ted)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting, for good cause and as unopposed, #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Response deadline 9/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/24/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Defendant HCR Manorcare Services, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McDonald, Ted)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of HCR Manorcare Services, LLC (McDonald, Ted)
July 27, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Centers for Care, LLC, HCR Healthcare, LLC, HCR ManorCare, Inc., HCR Manorcare Services, LLC, Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC, ProMedica Health System, Inc, Wichita Operations Associates, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff HENRY E BILLINGS - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff HENRY E BILLINGS. (Steele, Jonathan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5202916.), filed by HENRY E BILLINGS.(Steele, Jonathan)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billings v. Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Ed Billings
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR Manorcare Services, LLC
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Represented By: Michael W. Bootier
Represented By: Matthew T. Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manorcare of Wichita, KS LLC
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Represented By: Michael W. Bootier
Represented By: Matthew T. Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProMedica Health System, Inc
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Represented By: Michael W. Bootier
Represented By: Matthew T. Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Care, LLC
Represented By: Barbara K. Christopher
Represented By: Richard M. Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita Operations Associates, LLC
Represented By: Barbara K. Christopher
Represented By: Richard M. Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Represented By: Michael W. Bootier
Represented By: Matthew T. Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR ManorCare, Inc.
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Represented By: Michael W. Bootier
Represented By: Matthew T. Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?