Lenexa 95 Partners, LLC v. Kin, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lenexa 95 Partners, LLC
Defendant: Kin, Inc. and Kohl
Case Number: 2:2020cv02367
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Kin, Inc.. (McPherson, Brendan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lenexa 95 Partners, LLC of Discovery Requests (Rucinski, Dustin)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 1/19/2021. Dispositive motion deadline 2/16/2021. Mediation deadline 12/1/2020. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 10/23/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 02:30 PM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/16/2020. (ht)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lenexa 95 Partners, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Rucinski, Dustin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Disclosures and Documents by Kin, Inc.. (McPherson, Brendan)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 10:00 AM by phone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 8/26/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/9/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/17/20. (ctv)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kin, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (McPherson, Brendan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Kin, Inc..(McPherson, Brendan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Kin, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McPherson, Brendan)
July 29, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 29, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal by Kin, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (McPherson, Brendan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service upon Kin, Inc. on 6/30/2020 (ORIGINALLY FILED IN JOHNSON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 7/13/2020) (ca)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 20CV02693 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5211420.), filed by KIN, INC. f/k/a KOHL'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(McPherson, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenexa 95 Partners, LLC v. Kin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kin, Inc.
Represented By: Jason L. Bush
Represented By: Joshua Joe Langlois
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl
Represented By: Jason L. Bush
Represented By: Joshua Joe Langlois
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenexa 95 Partners, LLC
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Dustin Rucinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?