Broge v. Oriet
Plaintiff: Margaret Broge
Defendant: Joseph Oriet
Case Number: 2:2020cv02391
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/26/2020 for Defendant Joseph Oriet to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/6/2020. (ca)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Margaret Broge upon Joseph Oriet served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 (Corl, Brandon)
August 21, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Oriet. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 11, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Margaret Broge. (Corl, Brandon)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5224727.), filed by Margaret Broge.(Corl, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broge v. Oriet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Oriet
Represented By: Craig W. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Broge
Represented By: Brandon L. Corl
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?