Bond v. CBRE, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lance Bond
Defendant: CBRE, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02403
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER vacating deadlines in #5 initial order setting scheduling conference in light of the court's order #8 granting defendant's motion to compel arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/13/20. (jc)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #6 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The court hereby (1) grants defendant's motion (Dkt. #6 ), (2) orders the parties to arbitrate all claims advanced in the action; and (3) stays the case pending the results of the arbitration. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/13/2020. (sz)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 Response by Lance Bond to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Davey, Danielle) Modified to correct title on 10/13/2020 (hw).
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant CBRE, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily Smith)(Newsum, Patrick)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/13/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/10/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. (ss)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by CBRE, Inc.(Newsum, Patrick)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Lance Bond upon CBRE, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020 (Davey, Danielle)
August 17, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CBRE, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lance Bond. (Davey, Danielle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5229668.), filed by Lance L. Bond.(Davey, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond v. CBRE, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBRE, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Newsum, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Bond
Represented By: Danielle N. Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?