Ringle v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Ringle
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02408
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven S. Schulte for Katherine Ringle pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/9/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for attorney Steven Schulte to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5250355.) by Plaintiff Katherine Ringle (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Dickerson, Chelsea)
September 8, 2020 Filing 35 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Chelsea Dickerson on behalf of Katherine Ringle (Dickerson, Chelsea)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shaniqua L. Singleton as counsel for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc,and McKesson Corporation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/1/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 1, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for attorney Shaniqua L. Singleton to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5244482.) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Stubbs, Kara)
August 31, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jordan E. Jarreau as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Stubbs, Kara)
August 31, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Stubbs, Kara)
August 26, 2020 Filing 30 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kara Trouslot Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Stubbs, Kara)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 08/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion to Dismiss. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 08/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02233. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #22 Unopposed Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Kawanda Coleman's case be severed and transferred to the Baton Rouge Division of the Middle District of Louisiana (Civil case 3:20-cv-2227-S); b. Plaintiff Deborah Gaylor's case be severed and transferred to the Rochester Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2228-S); c. Plaintiff Gary Gross's case be severed and transferred to the Jefferson City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2229-S); d. Plaintiff Teresa Kearney's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2230-S); e. Plaintiff Gary Long's case be severed and transferred to the Memphis Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2231-S); f. Plaintiff Lecia Moore's case be severed and transferred to the Hartford Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2232-S); g. Plaintiff Katherine Ringle's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2233-S); h. Plaintiff Margaret Slocum's case be severed and transferred to the Detroit Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2234-S); i. Plaintiff Jeff Waller's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2235-S). Plaintiff Amanda Kozma is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1496-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/9/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900563) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued- Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Return of Service - C.R. Bard Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ringle v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Shaniqua L. Singleton
Represented By: Kara Trouslot Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Shaniqua L. Singleton
Represented By: Kara Trouslot Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Shaniqua L. Singleton
Represented By: Kara Trouslot Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Ringle
Represented By: Steven S. Schulte
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?